EP0431715 - Plate replacing apparatus for printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiyama, Hiroyuki, c/o Toride Plant Komori Corporation, 5-1, Higashi 4-chome Toride-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Miyamoto, Toshio, c/o Toride Plant Komori Corporation, 5-1, Higashi 4-chome Toride-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Hirose, Norio, c/o Toride Plant Komori Corporation, 5-1, Higashi 4-chome Toride-shi, Ibaraki / JP | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Stasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/24] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 73 04 66, Grubesallee 26 D-22124 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90250299.6 | 30.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | JP19890315380 | 06.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31538089 | JP19900087438 | 03.04.1990 Original published format: JP 8743890 | JP19900035417 | 03.04.1990 Original published format: JP 3541790 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431715 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431715 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431715 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0431715 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12, B41L31/00, B41L29/12 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
B41F27/1206 (EP,US);
B41L29/12 (EP,US);
B41L31/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/24] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Wechseln von Druckplatten für Druckpresse | [1991/24] | English: | Plate replacing apparatus for printing press | [1991/24] | French: | Appareil de remplacement de plaques pour presse d'impression | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 21.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1995
06.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mülheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | 02
11.12.1995
25.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Planeta-Bogenoffsetmaschinen Friedrich-List-Str. 47-49 01445 Radebeul / DE | 03
18.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 04
21.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG Postfach 6060 97010 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1995
06.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 D- 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
02
11.12.1995
25.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Planeta-Bogenoffsetmaschinen Friedrich-List-Str. 47-49 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
18.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04
21.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG Postfach 6060 97010 Würzburg / DE | |||
Former [1999/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1995
06.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 D- 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
02
11.12.1995
25.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE KBA-PLANETA AG Friedrich-List-Strasse 47-49 D-8122 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
18.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04
21.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG Postfach 6060 97010 Würzburg / DE | |||
Former [1999/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1995
06.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 D- 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
02
11.12.1995
25.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG Postfach 6060 97010 Würzburg / DE | |||
03
18.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04
21.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE KBA Koenig & Bauer-Albert AG Werk Würzburg Postfach 6060 D- 97010 Würzburg / DE | |||
Former [1996/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1995
06.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 D- 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
02
11.12.1995
25.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE KBA-PLANETA AG Friedrich-List-Strasse 47-49 D-8122 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
18.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04
21.12.1995
11.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE KBA Koenig & Bauer-Albert AG Werk Würzburg Postfach 6060 D- 97010 Würzburg / DE | |||
Former [1996/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1995
ADMISSIBLE MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 D- 63075 Offenbach / DE | 18.12.1995 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.01.1996 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 29.01.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.06.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.01.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.11.1999 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.05.2000 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 30.04.1997 | Appeal received No. T0476/97 | 11.07.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.11.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 09.11.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61227056 ; | [X]JP6262759 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 71 (M-567)(2518) March 4, 1987 & JP-A-61 227 056 (TOPPAN MOORE CO. LTD. ) October 9, 1986, & JP61227056 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 258 (M-618)(2705) August 21, 1987 & JP-A-62 62 759 (TORAY IND. INC. ) March 19, 1987, & JP6262759 A 00000000 |