EP0380196 - Safety connection into passages in a tubular body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cooper Industries, Inc. 1001 Fannin, Suite 4000 Houston Texas 77002 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states Cooper Industries Inc. 1001 Fannin, Suite 4000 Houston Texas 77002 / US | ||
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states CAMERON IRON WORKS USA, INC. 13013 Northwest Freeway Houston, Texas 77040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Kennard W. 3911 Badger Forest Drive Houston, Texas 77088 / US | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300037.0 | 03.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | US19890301629 | 25.01.1989 Original published format: US 301629 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0380196 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380196 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/11 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
F16L55/1108 (EP,US);
Y10S285/924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/31] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsverbindung für Zuführungen in rohrförmigen Körpern | [1990/31] | English: | Safety connection into passages in a tubular body | [1990/31] | French: | Raccord de sécurité pour les ouvertures d'un corps tubulaire | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4133560 (ISHIKAWA MASAKAZU, et al); | [AD]US4249670 (HUG CHARLES R [US]); | [A]EP0094459 (DEERE & CO [US]) |