EP0379277 - Napthtalocyanine based compound and optical recording medium containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.03.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Takeyuki 888-64, Katakura-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | 02 /
Shiro, Takashi 3-10-5-3, Shinmei Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 03 /
Iwata, Kaoru 1296-54, Katakura-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | 04 /
Daido, Takahiro Teijin Musashino-ryo 3-5-18, Tamadaira Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1990/30] | Application number, filing date | 90300138.6 | 05.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | JP19890005888 | 17.01.1989 Original published format: JP 588889 | JP19890040325 | 22.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4032589 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0379277 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0379277 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, C09B47/04, C09B47/08, C09B69/10, C07F7/02, C07F7/08, C08G77/26, C08G77/48 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
C09B47/045 (EP,US);
C08G77/26 (EP,US);
C08G77/48 (EP,US);
G11B7/248 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/30] | G11B7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/30] | Title | German: | Naphthalocyaninverbindung und sie enthaltendes optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1990/30] | English: | Napthtalocyanine based compound and optical recording medium containing the same | [1990/30] | French: | Composé de naphtalocyanine et médium d'enregistrement optique le comprenant | [1990/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/18] | 15.02.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0325990 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0285965 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0279501 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) |