EP0378449 - Information recording and retrieval system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Shigemi 2996-18, Koizumi-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Terashima, Shigeo 95-86, Nikaido Kaminosho-cho Tenri-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1990/29] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300425.7 | 15.01.1990 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | JP19890007101 | 13.01.1989 Original published format: JP 710189 | [1990/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0378449 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0378449 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378449 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/28, G11B11/10, G11B27/031, G11B27/10, G11B20/18 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
G11B11/10504 (EP);
G11B11/10595 (EP);
G11B27/034 (EP);
G11B27/036 (EP);
G11B27/105 (EP);
G11B27/11 (EP);
G11B27/327 (EP);
G11B27/329 (EP);
G11B7/00 (KR);
G11B2220/2525 (EP);
G11B2220/2545 (EP);
G11B2220/65 (EP);
G11B2220/913 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/29] | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungs- und Informationswiederherstellungssystem | [1990/29] | English: | Information recording and retrieval system | [1990/29] | French: | Système pour enregistrer et reproduire des informations | [1990/29] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.08.1996 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 21.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0288571 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0292917 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]FR2507045 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0248536 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]WO8808197 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0281415 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0164131 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | [A]DE3621263 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0279209 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) | [A] - AUDIO. vol. 71, no. 3, March 1987, PHILADELPHIA US POHLMANN ;page 26,28and30: "MINDING YOUR P's AND Q's" | Examination | EP0310678 |