EP0380261 - FDM inbound/TDM outbound communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1990/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kotzin, Michael Dale 45 Somerset Lane Buffalo Grove, Illinois 60089 / US | 02 /
Van Den Heuvel, Anthony P. 6355 NW 71st Terrace Parkland, Florida 33067 / US | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300613.8 | 22.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | US19890300661 | 23.01.1989 Original published format: US 300661 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0380261 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0380261 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/04 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
H04W84/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/31] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem im Frequenz-Multiplex-Verfahren in Richtung Mobil-Feststation und im Zeitmultiplex-Verfahren in Richtung Festmobilstation | [1990/31] | English: | FDM inbound/TDM outbound communication system | [1990/31] | French: | Système de communication à multiplex en fréquence pour les voies à destination de la station fixe et à multiplex temporel pour les voies à destination du mobile | [1990/31] | File destroyed: | 01.10.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/10] | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.08.1992 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]US4967407 ; | [A]EP0168647 ; | [A]WO8706083 |