EP0381508 - Use of cinnamamide for relaxing muscle tone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aihara, Hironaka 222, Futatsuya-2-chome Kitamoto-shi / JP | 02 /
Kurachi, Michio 94-7, Motojuku-6-chome Kitamoto-shi / JP | 03 /
Tomisawa, Kazuyuki 191-3, Sakae-4-chome, Inamachi Kitaadachi-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Kameo, Kazuya 17-4, Akamidai-4-chome Konosu-shi / JP | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Lamb, John Baxter, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Lamb, John Baxter, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301082.5 | 01.02.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | JP19890024159 | 02.02.1989 Original published format: JP 2415989 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381508 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381508 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381508 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
C07C233/11 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/32] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Cinnamamid-Derivaten zur Entspannung der Muskeln | [1990/32] | English: | Use of cinnamamide for relaxing muscle tone | [1990/32] | French: | Utilisation des dérivés du cinnamamide pour détendre le tonus des muscles | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 07.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR6489M [ ]; | US3780102 [ ] (GRAND M, et al); | FR2340303 [ ] (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) | Examination | US3659014 | - Dialog Information Services, file 5: Biosis 66-90, accession no. 0018138375; F.E. Soroko et al. & 17th Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience, New Orleans, Louisiana, US; November 16-21, 1987, Soc Neurosci Abstr 13(2), 1987 | - J. Med. Chem., vol. 9, no. 5, 1966, pages 675-681; E. Van Heyningen et al. | - Arzneim.-Forsch./Drug Res., vol. 27, no. 8, 1977, pages 1612-1615; K. Fasshauer et al. |