EP0382462 - Manufacturing method of frequency doubler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1-9-25, Kohamanishi, Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 559 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Kazuhisa 5-13-17-903 Senriokahigashi Settu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | 02 /
Ohmori, Shigeru 4-7-27-304 Toyosato, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 533 / JP | 03 /
Taniuchi, Tetsuo 2-5-2-304 Sumiyoshihigashi, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Osaka 658 / JP | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301206.0 | 06.02.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | JP19890030551 | 09.02.1989 Original published format: JP 3055189 | [1990/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0382462 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0382462 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0382462 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/37, G02B6/12, G02B6/13 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
G02F1/377 (EP,US);
G02B6/1345 (EP,US);
G02F2202/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/26] | G02F1/37, G02B6/12 | ||
Former IPC [1990/33] | G02F1/37 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/33] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren eines Frequenzverdopplers | [1990/33] | English: | Manufacturing method of frequency doubler | [1990/33] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un doubleur de fréquence | [1990/33] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 13.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3857689 (KOIZUMI K, et al) | [A] - SPIE - ADVANCED OPTOELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY vol. 864, 1987, BELLINGHAM, US pages 36 - 41; T. TANIUCHI ET AL.: 'Second harmonic generation in proton exchanged waveguides' |