EP0382582 - Tetra-aza macrocyles and processes for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LIMITED 216 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB | ||
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states CELLTECH LIMITED 216 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, David 12 East Atherton Street Durham, DH1 4DG / GB | 02 /
Eaton, Michael Anthony William Nethercote, Chinnor Road Aston Rowant, Oxfordshire, OX9 5SH / GB | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301477.7 | 12.02.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | GB19890003023 | 10.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8903023 | [1990/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0382582 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0382582 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6524, A61K31/675 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
C07F9/6524 (EP);
A61K51/0482 (EP);
A61K51/1093 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K2123/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/33] | Title | German: | Tetraaza-makrocyclische Verbindungen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1990/33] | English: | Tetra-aza macrocyles and processes for their preparation | [1990/33] | French: | Tetra-aza macrocycles et leurs procédés de préparation | [1990/33] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Request for further processing for: | 24.01.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.1995 | DK | 19.04.1995 | ES | 19.04.1995 | GR | 19.04.1995 | SE | 19.07.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 19.04.1995 | |
DK | 19.04.1995 | ||
GR | 19.04.1995 | ||
SE | 19.07.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 19.04.1995 | |
DK | 19.04.1995 | ||
SE | 19.07.1995 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 19.04.1995 | |
SE | 19.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 19.04.1995 | |
SE | 19.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 19.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0197437 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) | [Y] - BULLETIN OF THE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USSR/ DIV. CHEMICAL SCIENCE, vol. 33, no. 4, part 1, April 1984, pages 777-782, Plenum Publishing Corp., New York, NY, US; I.M. KABACHNIK et al.: "Synthesis and acid-base and complex-forming properties of 1,4,7,10-tetrakis(dihydroxyphosporylmethyl)-1,4,7,10-tetraazacyclododecane" | [Y] - BULLETIN OF THE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USSR/DIV. OF CHEMICAL SCIENCE, vol. 36, no. 2, part 2, February 1987, pages 372-376, Plenum Publishing Corp., New York, NY, US; S.A. PISAREVA et al.: "Synthesis and complexing properties of 1,5,8,12-tetrakis(dihydroxyphosphorylmethyl)-1,5,8,12-tetraazacyclotetradecane, a cyclopendant phosphororganic complexon" |