EP0383622 - Filtration process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1990 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOM HOLDINGS LIMITED 5 New Street St. Hélier Jersey Channel Island / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states TOM HOLDINGS LIMITED 5 New Street St. Hélier Jersey Channel Island / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Du Plessis, Jan Abraham 4 Kameel Street Bronkhorstspruit, Transvaal Province / ZA | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301713.5 | 16.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | ZA19890001220 | 16.02.1989 Original published format: ZA 891220 | [1990/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383622 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383622 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/33, B01D29/35, B01D29/54, B01D29/86 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
B01D29/115 (EP);
B01D29/118 (EP);
B01D29/54 (EP);
B01D29/86 (EP);
B01D29/902 (EP);
B01D2201/282 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B01D29/115, B01D29/118, B01D29/54, B01D29/86, B01D29/902 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Filtrationsverfahren | [1990/34] | English: | Filtration process | [1990/34] | French: | Procédé filtrant | [1990/34] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE380465 ; | [X]FR2513536 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]); | [X]US3581893 (RICH JOHN P); | [X]EP0187553 (LAMORT E & M [FR]); | [X]GB1541086 (BESSO R); | [X]EP0042742 (BLACK CLAWSON CO [US]); | [X]GB1060019 (GERTRUD BURKHARDT, et al); | [A]US3997441 (PAMPLIN JR LEE F) |