EP0385626 - Papermaking method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI-CYANAMID, LTD. 3-13 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states MITSUI-CYANAMID, LTD. 3-13 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Naotaka c/o Mitsui-Cyanamid, Ltd. 3-13 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Arai, Takeo, c/o Mitsui-Cyanamid, Ltd. Ofuna Technical Laboratory 1190 Kasama-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Fujiyoshi, Hitoshi, c/o Mitsui-Cyanamid, Ltd. Ofuna Technical Laboratory 1190 Kasama-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Shirota, Masako, c/o Mitsui-Cyanamid, Ltd. Ofuna Technical Laboratory 1190 Kasama-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1990/36] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301739.0 | 19.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | JP19890043094 | 27.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4309489 | [1990/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385626 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0385626 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/45, D21H17/43, C08F291/00 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
D21H17/45 (EP,US);
D21H5/141 (KR);
C08F279/02 (EP,US);
D21H17/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Papier | [1990/36] | English: | Papermaking method | [1990/36] | French: | Méthode de fabrication de papier | [1990/36] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61225394 ; | [XD]JP61261302 ; | [Y]JP57106798 ; | [Y]JP58186696 ; | [Y]EP0221400 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [Y] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, vol. 57, no. 10, April 1987, page 1469, abstract 13393, Appleton, Wisconsin, US; & JP-A-61 225 394 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER) 07-10-1986, & JP61225394 A 00000000 | [XD] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, vol. 58, no. 1, July 1987, page 137, abstract no. 1067, Appleton, Wisconsin, US; & JP-A-61 261 302 (NIPPON ZEON) 19-11-1986, & JP61261302 A 00000000 | [Y] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, vol. 53, no. 10, April 1983, page 1190, abstract no. 1190. Appleton, Wisconsin, US; & JP-A-57 106 798 (MITSUI TOATSU) 02-07-1982, & JP57106798 A 00000000 | [Y] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, vol. 55, no. 5, November 1984, page 631, abstract no. 5991, Appleton, Wisconsin, US; & JP-A-58 186 696 (DENKI CHEMICAL) 31-10-1983, & JP58186696 A 00000000 |