blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0384706

EP0384706 - Variable inlet guide vanes for a compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.1994
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.04.1994 [1994/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [1990/35]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Patel, Manubhai Motibhai
18 Orchard Park Drive
Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US
02 / Hoeft, Robert Francis
1562 Kingston Avenue
Schenectady, New York 12309 / US
[1990/35]
Representative(s)Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London
WC2R 3AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/14]Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Former [1990/35]Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street
London WC2N 6DU / GB
Application number, filing date90301806.720.02.1990
[1990/35]
Priority number, dateUS1989031226421.02.1989         Original published format: US 312264
[1990/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0384706
Date:29.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0384706
Date:14.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.1990
ClassificationIPC:F01D17/16, F01D5/26, F01D9/04
[1990/35]
CPC:
F01D17/162 (EP,US); F01D5/26 (EP,US); F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F04D29/563 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1990/35]
TitleGerman:Verstellbare Leitschaufeln für einen Kompressor[1990/35]
English:Variable inlet guide vanes for a compressor[1990/35]
French:Aubes de redresseur à calage variable pour compresseur[1990/35]
Examination procedure10.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/07]
09.01.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.09.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1992Fee for grant paid
19.11.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3042370  (WELSH HARVEY W);
 [A]US3070352  (WELSH HARVEY W);
 [A]US3314654  (SPENCER THENAULT GEORGES, et al);
 [A]CH491288  (SULZER AG [CH]);
 [A]FR2106561  (UNITED KINGDOM GOVERNMENT);
 [A]DE2165529  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.