EP0388029 - Multi-actuator hydraulic press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Day, Charles L. Days Mills Road, PO Box 1097 Kennebunk Maine 04043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states Day, Charles L. Days Mills Road, PO Box 1097 Kennebunk, Maine 04043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Sommerville, John Henry, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | Sommerville, John Henry, et al SOMMERVILLE & RUSHTON 11 Holywell Hill St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 1EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301814.1 | 20.02.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | US19890322531 | 13.03.1989 Original published format: US 322531 | [1990/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0388029 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0388029 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388029 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B30B15/22 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
B30B15/161 (EP,US);
B30B1/323 (EP,US);
B30B1/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/38] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Presse mit mehreren Stellantrieben | [1990/38] | English: | Multi-actuator hydraulic press | [1990/38] | French: | Presse hydraulique à multiples vérins | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.1994 | BE | 13.04.1994 | CH | 13.04.1994 | DE | 13.04.1994 | DK | 13.04.1994 | ES | 13.04.1994 | FR | 13.04.1994 | GR | 13.04.1994 | IT | 13.04.1994 | LI | 13.04.1994 | NL | 13.04.1994 | SE | 13.04.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
BE | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
DK | 13.04.1994 | ||
ES | 13.04.1994 | ||
GR | 13.04.1994 | ||
IT | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
SE | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
BE | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
DK | 13.04.1994 | ||
GR | 13.04.1994 | ||
IT | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
SE | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
BE | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
DK | 13.04.1994 | ||
GR | 13.04.1994 | ||
IT | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
BE | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
DK | 13.04.1994 | ||
IT | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
BE | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
DK | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
BE | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
BE | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/08] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
CH | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 13.04.1994 | |
LI | 13.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3757680 (WILLIAMS J); | [A]US3827328 (LA FLAMME P, et al); | [AD]US3920364 (CADOGAN-RAWLINSON CHRISTOPHER, et al); | [A]DE2642357 (HOESCH & SOEHNE EBERHARD) |