EP0385650 - Sheet stacking apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.1991 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Rue SYSTEMS LIMITED De la Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states DE LA RUE SYSTEMS LIMITED De la Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pilling, Roger 34 Elmsleigh Gardens Bassett, Southampton / GB | 02 /
Martin, Harvey Graham Cedar Lodge, Oakfield Avenue East Wittering, Chichester, West Sussex / GB | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301872.9 | 21.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | GB19890004566 | 28.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8904566 | [1990/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385650 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07D1/00 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
G07D11/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, SE [1990/36] | Title | German: | Blätterstapeleinrichtung | [1990/36] | English: | Sheet stacking apparatus | [1990/36] | French: | Appareillage d'empilement de feuilles | [1990/36] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/43] | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2601343 ; | [Y]EP0211814 ; | [A]EP0130081 |