EP0403047 - A frequency divider circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maemura, Kousei, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Optelectronic and Microwave Device, R & D Lab. 1 Mizuhara 4-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Hiroichi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Tsushinki Seisakusho, 1-1, Tsukaguchi Hon. 8-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302163.2 | 28.02.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | JP19890148928 | 12.06.1989 Original published format: JP 14892889 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403047 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403047 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403047 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03K23/58, H03K21/38 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
H03K21/38 (EP,US);
H03K23/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/51] | H03K23/58 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/51] | Title | German: | Frequenzteiler-Schaltung | [1990/51] | English: | A frequency divider circuit | [1990/51] | French: | Circuit diviseur de fréquence | [1990/51] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/36: Teilanmeldung 91118873.8 eingereicht am 28/02/90 | EPB 1995/36: Divisional application 91118873.8 filed on 28/02/90 | EPB 1995/36: Demande divisionnaire 91118873.8 déposée le 28/02/90 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91118873.8 / EP0471390 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59156028 ; | [A]JP5679534 ; | [X]US4181862 (DINGWALL ANDREW G F [US]); | [A]US4150337 (SHELLER DANIEL R) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 8 (E-289), 12th January 1985; & JP-A-59 156 028 (IWASAKI TSUSCHINKI K.K.) 05-09-1984, & JP59156028 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 145 (E-74), 12th September 1981; & JP-A-56 79 534 (FUJITSU K.K.) 30-06-1981, & JP5679534 A 00000000 | Examination | - Introduction to SYSTEM DESIGN USING ICs, B.S.Sonde, Wiley eastern Ltd., 1980, p127 |