EP0385775 - Herbicidal sulfonamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICI AUSTRALIA LIMITED 1 Nicholson Street Melbourne Victoria 3001 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states ICI AUSTRALIA LIMITED 1 Nicholson Street Melbourne Victoria 3001 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Janet 1 McAuley Drive Rosanna 3084, Victoria / AU | 02 /
Bell, Stephen 18 Mirams Street Ascot Vale 3032, Victoria / AU | 03 /
Best, Wayne 4/4 Carmyle Court Avondale Heights 3034, Victoria / AU | 04 /
Watson, Keith 18 Hamilton Avenue Blackburn 3130, Victoria / AU | 05 /
Drygala, Peter F205/1 Dick Ward Drive Fannie Bay 0820, Northern Territory / AU | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Greaves, Carol Pauline, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Greaves, Carol Pauline, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302188.9 | 01.03.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | AU19890003050 | 03.03.1989 Original published format: AU 305089 | [1990/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385775 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, A01N47/36, C07D417/12, C07D403/12, C07D265/36 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP);
A01N47/36 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP);
C07D491/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/36] | Title | German: | Herbizide Sulfonamide | [1990/36] | English: | Herbicidal sulfonamides | [1990/36] | French: | Sulfonamides herbicides | [1990/36] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 01.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/12] | 29.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0082681 ; | [A]EP0168135 |