EP0392660 - Probe head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennett, Simon James Endfield Cottage, The Park Painswick, Gloucestershire GL6 6SN / GB | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Waite, John, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Waite, John, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302595.5 | 12.03.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | GB19890008537 | 14.04.1989 Original published format: GB 8908537 | GB19890027312 | 02.12.1989 Original published format: GB 8927312 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392660 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392660 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392660 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/00 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
G01B5/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Tastkopf | [1990/42] | English: | Probe head | [1990/42] | French: | Tête de palpeur | [1990/42] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/42] | 09.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.09.1993 | SE | 08.09.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1994/45] | SE | 08.09.1993 | |
FR | 28.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 08.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61204502 ; | [A]FR1544088 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [A]GB2129357 (HILTI AG); | [A]DE3712249 (DRECOLL HARM [DE]); | [AD]WO8502138 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 35 (P-542)(2482), 3 February 1987; & JP-A-61 204 502 (FUJIOKA SEIKO K.K.) 10.09.1986, & JP61204502 A 19870203 | Examination | GB2139357 | - Renishaw PH9 Automated Inspection System for Measuring Machines |