EP0396240 - Ceramic meterial and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAMAN SCIENCES CORPORATION 1500 Garden of the Gods Road, P.O. Box 7463 Colorado Springs, CO 80933-7463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states KAMAN SCIENCES CORPORATION 1500 Garden of the Gods Road, P.O. Box 7463 Colorado Springs, CO 80933-7463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MacMillan, Shaun T. 1001 South Street Castle Rock, CO 80104 / US | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/21] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/45] | Hackett, Sean James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302941.1 | 19.03.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | US19890348035 | 05.05.1989 Original published format: US 348035 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0396240 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396240 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/12 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
C23C18/1208 (EP,US);
C04B35/48 (KR);
C23C18/12 (KR);
C23C18/1241 (EP,US);
C23C18/1295 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/45] | Title | German: | Keramisches Material und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1990/45] | English: | Ceramic meterial and method for producing the same | [1990/45] | French: | Matériau céramique et son procédé de fabrication | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Request for further processing for: | 06.05.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.1996 | BE | 03.01.1996 | CH | 03.01.1996 | DK | 03.01.1996 | ES | 03.01.1996 | GR | 03.01.1996 | LI | 03.01.1996 | NL | 03.01.1996 | LU | 31.03.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
CH | 03.01.1996 | ||
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
ES | 03.01.1996 | ||
GR | 03.01.1996 | ||
LI | 03.01.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
CH | 03.01.1996 | ||
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
GR | 03.01.1996 | ||
LI | 03.01.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
GR | 03.01.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
CH | 09.04.1996 | ||
LI | 09.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
GR | 03.01.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 03.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63190174 ; | [X]EP0270231 (DOW CORNING [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 472 (C-551)[3319], 9th December 1988; & JP-A-63 190 174 (NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD) 05-08-1988, & JP63190174 A 00000000 | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 472 (C-551)[3319], 09 December 1988 |