EP0390467 - Digital servo control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogino, Tsukasa 3-9-307 Nijigaoka 2-chome Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303199.5 | 26.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | JP19890073999 | 28.03.1989 Original published format: JP 7399989 | JP19900064306 | 16.03.1990 Original published format: JP 6430690 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390467 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390467 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390467 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B21/08 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
G11B7/0945 (EP,US);
G11B7/0901 (EP,US);
G11B7/0908 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/40] | G11B7/09 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/40] | Title | German: | Digitales Servosteuergerät | [1990/40] | English: | Digital servo control apparatus | [1990/40] | French: | Appareil de commande d'asservissement digital | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 13.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0261916 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0249462 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) |