EP0396248 - Electrical pin and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Keiichi 6-8-14 Shimouma, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Oshima, Tsutomu 2-29-3 Chuo-cho, Meguro-Ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kitai, Toshihiko 1347-5 Higashi-Otake Isehara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Fukuda, Katsunori 2-12-23 Yaei Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303252.2 | 27.03.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | JP19890097009 | 17.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9700989 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396248 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396248 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396248 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/04 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
H05K3/3426 (EP);
H01R43/00 (KR);
H01L21/4885 (EP);
H01L23/49811 (EP);
H01R12/52 (EP);
H01R43/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/45] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Steckerstift und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1990/45] | English: | Electrical pin and method for making same | [1990/45] | French: | Contact électrique à broche et méthode de sa fabrication | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3329115 (AUGAT INC [US]); | [A]US3561107 (BEST HOWARD S, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 19, no. 3, August 1976, pages 836,837, New York, US; J.A. LAU et al.: "Multiple pin loader for specialized packaging applications" |