EP0390510 - Optical information reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiroyoshi, Jun 3-chome, 29, 21-407, Okubo-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570 / JP | 02 /
Kuroki, Yuzuru 2-2, Teinehigashi 1, Kita 2-2, Nishi-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 063 / JP | 03 /
Satoh, Isao 36-12, Higashigaoka, Narita Neyagawa-shi, Osaka-fu 572 / JP | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303271.2 | 28.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | JP19890078856 | 29.03.1989 Original published format: JP 7885689 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390510 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390510 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390510 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B20/12 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
G11B20/1816 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B7/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1990/40] | G11B20/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/40] | Title | German: | Optisches Gerät zur Datenwiedergabe | [1990/40] | English: | Optical information reproducing apparatus | [1990/40] | French: | Appareil optique d'information | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63187468 ; | [A]WO8403987 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0282036 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]DE3704898 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 468 (P-797)(3315) 08 December 1988, & JP-A-63 187468 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO.) 08 March 1988,, & JP63187468 A 19880308 |