EP0420378 - Expandable shelf display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARLBORO MARKETING, INC. d/b/a THE HOWARD MARLBORO GROUP 475 Tenth Avenue New York New York 10018 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states MARLBORO MARKETING, INC. d/b/a THE HOWARD MARLBORO GROUP 475 Tenth Avenue New York New York 10018 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merl, Milton 475 Tenth Avenue New York, NY 10018 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303328.0 | 28.03.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890412787 | 26.09.1989 Original published format: US 412787 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420378 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420378 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/10, A47B45/00, A47F5/06 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
A47F5/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/14] | A47B45/00, A47F5/10, A47F5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, NL [1991/14] | Title | German: | Erweiterbare Warenablage | [1991/14] | English: | Expandable shelf display | [1991/14] | French: | Rayon d'étalage extensible | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/12] | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1578145 ; | [A]GB462775 (EDUARD LUDWIG REDLHAMMER, et al); | [A]US2765999 (BAKER TILLMAN A); | [A]US4453640 (CILLARIO LORENZO [IT]) |