Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR930008391B | 31.08.1993 | B1 | KR900014720 | 24.10.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8101589 | 31.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0390589 | Global Dossier | 01.02.1995 | B1 | EP0390589 | 02.05.1991 | A3 | EP0390589 | 03.10.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP5047490 | 01.03.1990 | JP8101589 | 31.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69016482T | 14.09.1995 | T2 | DE69016482D1 | 16.03.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP5047490 | 01.03.1990 | JP8101589 | 31.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2580823B | 12.02.1997 | B2 | JPH0323314 | 31.01.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP5047490 | 01.03.1990 | JP8101589 | 31.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5050557 | 24.09.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP5047490 | 01.03.1990 | JP8101589 | 31.03.1989 |