EP0392722 - Pneumatic remote control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITAX (GECO) S.A. 88 Avenue de Fontainebleau F-77981 Saint Fargeau Ponthierry / FR | [1990/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duroux, Bernard 19 Domaine de la Boissière F-78890 Garancières / FR | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Hollinghurst, Antony Britax Childcare Limited 1 Churchill Way West Andover Hampshire SP10 3UW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Hollinghurst, Antony B.S.G. International plc Patent Department Castle Trading Estate East Street Portchester, Hants PO16 9SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303543.4 | 03.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | GB19890008383 | 13.04.1989 Original published format: GB 8908383 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392722 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392722 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392722 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06, F15B7/00 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
B60R1/0625 (EP);
F15B7/001 (EP);
F15B7/003 (EP);
F15B7/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1993/25] |
Former [1990/42] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Pneumatische Fernsteuerungseinrichtung | [1990/42] | English: | Pneumatic remote control system | [1990/42] | French: | Dispositif pneumatique de commande à distance | [1990/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 15.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0282233 ; | [A]US2906098 ; | [A]DE3443745 |