EP0392738 - Micro- and nano-porous metallic structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sieradzki, Karl 3703 Gardenview Road Baltimore Maryland 21208 / US | For all designated states Newman, Roger C. 2 Moss Lane Alderley Edge Cheshire SK9 7HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states Sieradzki, Karl 3703 Gardenview Road Baltimore, Maryland 21208 / US | ||
For all designated states Newman, Roger C. 2 Moss Lane Alderley Edge, Cheshire SK9 7HN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303634.1 | 04.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | US19890338260 | 14.04.1989 Original published format: US 338260 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0392738 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C25F3/02, // B01D71/02 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
C25F3/02 (EP,US);
C25F5/00 (KR);
B01D67/0044 (EP,US);
B01D67/0062 (EP,US);
B01D67/0065 (EP,US);
B01D71/022 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2325/22 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Mikro- und nanoporöse, metallische Strukturen | [1990/42] | English: | Micro- and nano-porous metallic structures | [1990/42] | French: | Structures métalliques, micro- et nano poreuses | [1990/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/49] | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3533863 (LEE DAEYONG, et al) |