EP0452576 - Shoe insole laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chen, Chi-Ming No. 15 Chung-Ming Erh St. Taichung City / TW | [1991/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Crisp, David Norman, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Crisp, David Norman, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304153.1 | 18.04.1990 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452576 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A43B17/03 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
A43B17/03 (EP);
A43B1/0009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | Laminierte Einlegesohle | [1991/43] | English: | Shoe insole laminate | [1991/43] | French: | Semelle intérieure laminée | [1991/43] | File destroyed: | 15.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/01] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4112599 ; | [X]DE2428357 ; | [X]DE7633023U ; | [X]CH604587 ; | [Y]DE595976 ; | [A]DE3130046 ; | [A]DE416723 ; | [A]US2237190 ; | [A]US4914836 |