EP0396337 - A welding flux and welding electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1994 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inco Alloys International, Inc. 3200 Riverside Drive Huntington West Virginia 25720 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states Inco Alloys International, Inc. 3200 Riverside Drive Huntington West Virginia 25720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bates, Thomas Outland 14, Crestridge Drive Huntington, West Virginia 25705 / US | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304569.8 | 26.04.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | US19890343630 | 27.04.1989 Original published format: US 343630 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0396337 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/365, B23K35/30 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
B23K35/365 (EP,US);
B23K35/36 (KR);
B23K35/302 (EP,US);
B23K35/3603 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/45] | Title | German: | Schweissflussmittel und Schweisselektrode | [1990/45] | English: | A welding flux and welding electrode | [1990/45] | French: | Flux et électrode de soudage | [1990/45] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/13] | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2745771 (RAYMOND PEASE GEORGE, et al); | [YD]US3124479 ; | [Y]FR2017084 (INT NICKEL LTD); | [A]US3686027 (PETERSEN WALTER A); | [A]EP0195634 (INCO ALLOYS INT [US]) | [A] - AUTOMATIC WELDING, vol. 23, no. 12, December 1970, pages 60-63; S.L. MILICHENKO et al.: "Welding materials for depositing wear-resistant copper-nickel alloys" |