EP0399669 - Fastener with increased reach-back [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Revocation of patent | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLEXIBLE STEEL LACING COMPANY 2525 Wisconsin Avenue Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | [1990/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Musil, Edward Charles 4142 Fisherman Terrace Lyons, Illinois 60534 / US | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304622.5 | 27.04.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | US19890355170 | 22.05.1989 Original published format: US 355170 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0399669 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399669 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/02 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
F16G3/02 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1608 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1632 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1636 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/48] | Title | German: | Verbinder mit vergrössertem Haltebereich | [1990/48] | English: | Fastener with increased reach-back | [1990/48] | French: | Agrafe à portée de support augmentée | [1990/48] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.03.1995
04.04.1995
ADMISSIBLE MATO Maschinen- und Metallwarenfabrik Curt Matthaei GmbH & Co. KG Bieberer Str. 215-217 63071 Offenbach / DE Opponent's representative Schieferdecker, Lutz Patentanwalt Herrnstrasse 37 63065 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.03.1995
04.04.1995
ADMISSIBLE MATO Maschinen- und Metallwarenfabrik Curt Matthaei GmbH & Co. KG Bieberer Str. 215-217 63071 Offenbach / DE Opponent's representative Schieferdecker, Lutz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Herrnstrasse 37 D-63065 Offenbach / DE | 24.04.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.11.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR881796 (PAUL WEVER KOMMANDIT GES); | [X]FR1233111 (TERRE DE LABRADOR); | [AD]US4625369 (MUSIL EDWARD C [US]); | [AD]US4315349 (STOLZ HERMANN) |