Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0397407 | Global Dossier | 07.04.1993 | B1 | EP0397407 | 15.05.1991 | A3 | EP0397407 | 14.11.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP11938789 | 12.05.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69001272T | 22.07.1993 | T2 | DE69001272D1 | 13.05.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP11938789 | 12.05.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2808133B | 08.10.1998 | B2 | JPH02297492 | 07.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP11938789 | 12.05.1989 |