EP0397449 - Electrode support structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Radnedge, Colin George 49 Anchor Road Kingswood, Bristol / GB | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Trevor Cecil, et al c/o Rolls-Royce PLC Patents Department P.O. Box 3 Filton, Bristol BS12 7QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Jennings, Trevor Cecil, et al c/o Rolls-Royce PLC, Patents Department, P.O. Box 3 Filton, Bristol BS12 7QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304947.6 | 08.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | GB19890010477 | 06.05.1989 Original published format: GB 8910477 | [1990/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397449 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397449 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B23H11/00 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
B23H11/00 (EP,US);
B23H7/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/46] | Title | German: | Elektrodenstütze | [1990/46] | English: | Electrode support structure | [1990/46] | French: | Structure de support d'électrode | [1990/46] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4188522 (BAKER GEORGE E [GB]); | [A]DE2450603 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CORP) |