EP0399738 - Analogue to digital converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thurston, Andrew Mark 38 Foxglove Way Springfield, Chelmsford Essex / GB | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Waters, Jeffrey, et al The General Electric Company plc GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Waters, Jeffrey, et al The General Electric Company plc GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305436.9 | 18.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | GB19890012137 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: GB 8912137 | GB19900009197 | 24.04.1990 Original published format: GB 9009197 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399738 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399738 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03M3/02 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
H03M3/3283 (EP,US);
H03M3/408 (EP,US);
H03M3/43 (EP,US);
H03M3/438 (EP,US);
H03M3/454 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Analog-/Digitalwandler | [1990/48] | English: | Analogue to digital converter | [1990/48] | French: | Convertisseur analogique-numérique | [1990/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 01.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 04.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO8907368 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]EP0092879 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR [FR]) | [X] - NEUES AUS DER TECHNIK, no. 3, 15th June 1983, page 3, Würzburg, DE; "Delta-sigma-modulation" | [XP] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 25, no. 23, 9th November 1989, pages 1560-1561, Hitchin, GB; R. SCHREIBER et al.: "Bandpass sigma-delta modulation" | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-22, no. 6, December 1987, pages 921-929, New York, US; Y. MATSUYA et al.: "A 16-bit oversampling A-to-D conversion technology using triple-integrateion noise shaping" |