EP0400870 - Multifunctional viscosity index improver derived from polyamine containing one primary amino group and at least one secondary amino group exhibiting improved low temperature viscometric properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 200 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 200 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutierrez, Antonio 22 Tar Heels Road Mercerville, New Jersey 08619 / US | 02 /
Chung, David Yen-Lung 21 Keen Lane Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Northover, Robert Frank, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Northover, Robert Frank, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305567.1 | 22.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | US19890358729 | 30.05.1989 Original published format: US 358729 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0400870 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400870 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C10M143/02, C10M149/06, C10M151/02, C10M159/12, // (C10M149/06, 143:02),(C10M151/02, 143:02),(C10M159/12, 129:28, 129:42, 129:93, 133:06, 135:22, 143:02), C10N20:04, C10N30:02, C10N30:04, C10N60:00, C10N60:10, C10N70:00 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
C10L1/2364 (EP);
C10L1/2468 (EP);
C10M143/00 (EP);
C10M143/02 (EP);
C10M149/06 (EP);
C10M151/02 (EP);
C10M2205/00 (EP);
C10M2205/02 (EP);
C10M2205/022 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/042 (EP);
C10M2215/26 (EP);
C10M2217/024 (EP);
C10M2217/046 (EP);
C10M2217/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C10M143/02, C10M143/00 (EP);
C10M149/06, C10M143/02, C10M143/00 (EP);
C10M151/02, C10M143/02, C10M143/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/49] | Title | German: | Multifunktionaler Viskositätsindexverbesserer, hergestellt aus Polyamin, welcher eine primäre und mindestens eine sekundäre Amino-Gruppe enthält und der verbesserte viskometrische Eigenschaften bei niedrigen Temperaturen aufweist | [1990/49] | English: | Multifunctional viscosity index improver derived from polyamine containing one primary amino group and at least one secondary amino group exhibiting improved low temperature viscometric properties | [1990/49] | French: | Agent améliorant l'indice de viscosité à buts multiples dérivé de polyamine contenant un groupe amine primaire et au moins un groupe amine secondaire et présentant des propriétés viscométriques améliorées à basse température | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Request for further processing for: | 26.06.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.07.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0299608 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]); | [AD]DE3025274 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [A]EP0050994 (COOPER EDWIN INC [US]); | [A]EP0146162 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) |