EP0399825 - Manufacture of containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOMIX-CHIPMAN LIMITED Portland Building, Portland Street Staple Hill Bristol BS16 4PS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states NOMIX-CHIPMAN LIMITED Portland Building, Portland Street Staple Hill, Bristol BS16 4PS / GB | ||
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states NOMIX MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED Portland Building Portland Street Staple Hill Bristol BS16 4PS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gill, David Charles Wellfield House, Parkhouse Lane Keynsham, Bristol BS18 2SG / GB | 02 /
Pressey, Garry Kenneth 42 Brook Road Mangotsfield, Bristol / GB | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [1990/48] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305664.6 | 24.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | GB19890012224 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: GB 8912224 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399825 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399825 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399825 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29D22/00, B65D77/06 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
B65D81/245 (EP,US);
B65D85/00 (KR);
A01M7/0085 (EP,US);
B05B9/08 (EP,US);
B29D22/003 (EP,US);
B29C51/10 (EP,US);
B29C63/00 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/20 (EP,US);
B29L2022/005 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7172 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1031 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/48] | B29D22/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Behältern | [1990/48] | English: | Manufacture of containers | [1990/48] | French: | Fabrication de réservoirs | [1990/48] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.1994 | BE | 24.08.1994 | CH | 24.08.1994 | DK | 24.08.1994 | GR | 24.08.1994 | IT | 24.08.1994 | LI | 24.08.1994 | NL | 24.08.1994 | SE | 24.11.1994 | DE | 25.11.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
DK | 24.08.1994 | ||
GR | 24.08.1994 | ||
IT | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
DE | 25.11.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
DK | 24.08.1994 | ||
IT | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
DE | 25.11.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
DK | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
DE | 25.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
DE | 25.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
DE | 25.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/16] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
DE | 25.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
DE | 25.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | CH | 24.08.1994 | |
LI | 24.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5662131 ; | [A]US1816202 (BELL ARTHUR W, et al); | [A]GB705971 (CLINTON VINCENT CARLSON); | [Y]US4009981 (ROSEN STANLEY R); | [Y]EP0029152 (JOHANN KONIG & SOHN [DE]); | [A]DE3006971 (KIMNACH ALLIT PLASTIK [DE]); | [A]EP0194871 (TPT LTD [GB]); | [A]US4631685 (PETER DAVID A [US]); | [A]EP0284024 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0300762 (NOMIX MFG CO LTD [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 123 (M-82)[795], 8th August 1981; & JP-A-56 62 131 (TOUKAN KOGYO K.K.) 27-05-1981, & JP5662131 A 00000000 |