EP0400927 - Recording and reproducing apparatus using opto-magneto media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imanaka, Ryoichi 2-6 Kuzuhamisaki 3-chome Hirakata-shi / JP | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1990/49] | Application number, filing date | 90305745.3 | 25.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | JP19890134915 | 29.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13491589 | JP19890182876 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18287689 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400927 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400927 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400927 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10, G11B7/14 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
G11B11/10576 (EP,US);
G11B11/10513 (EP,US);
G11B11/10517 (EP,US);
G11B11/10597 (EP,US);
G11B7/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/49] | G11B11/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/49] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabegerät mit einem magnetooptischen Medium | [1990/49] | English: | Recording and reproducing apparatus using opto-magneto media | [1990/49] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction utilisant un support magnéto-optique | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61243975 ; | [A]JP61184744 ; | [A]JP60093646 | [X] - SPIE Optical Data Storage Topical Meeting vol. 1078, 17 January 1989, Los Angeles, California pages 98 - 104; Ryuichi Katayama et al.: "Multi-beam magneto-optical disk drive for parallel read/write operation" | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 93 (P-559) 24 March 1987, & JP-A-61 243975 (SONY CORP) 30 October 1986,, & JP61243975 A 19861030 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 9 (P-534) 10 January 1987, & JP-A-61 184744 (CANON INC) 18 August 1986,, & JP61184744 A 19860818 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 239 (P-391) 25 September 1985, & JP-A-60 093646 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) 25 May 1985,, & JP60093646 A 19850525 | Examination | EP0275323 | EP0243656 |