EP0400970 - Perpendicular magnetic recording medium and production method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiuchi, Katsumi 1840, Sugikubo, Ebina-shi Kanagawa, 243-04 / JP | 02 /
Wakamatsu, Hiroaki 3340-8, Izumicho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 245 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Fumitake 30, Shimokodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 04 /
Koshikawa, Takao 3-8-3-105 Morinosato Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa, 243-01 / JP | [1996/43] |
Former [1990/49] | 01 /
Kiuchi, Katusmi 1840, Sugikubo, Ebina-shi Kanagawa, 243-04 / JP | ||
02 /
Wakamatsu, Hiroaki 3340-8, Izumicho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 245 / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Fumitake 30, Shimokodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | |||
04 /
Koshikawa, Takao 3-8-3-105 Morinosato Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa, 243-01 / JP | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305842.8 | 30.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | JP19890138273 | 31.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13827389 | JP19890138274 | 31.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13827489 | JP19890302719 | 20.11.1989 Original published format: JP 30271989 | JP19890329240 | 19.12.1989 Original published format: JP 32924089 | JP19890330667 | 20.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33066789 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400970 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400970 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400970 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/66 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/667 (KR);
G11B5/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/1278 (KR);
G11B5/66 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/74 (EP,US);
G11B5/743 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/84 (KR);
G11B2005/0013 (EP,US);
G11B2005/0029 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/012 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/49] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium für Senkrechtmagnetisierung und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1990/49] | English: | Perpendicular magnetic recording medium and production method thereof | [1990/49] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement magnétique perpendiculaire et son procédé de fabrication | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 21.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.10.1996 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0099564 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]DD240275 (ROBOTRON ELEKTRONIK [DD]) |