EP0401028 - Connector devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hironori, C/o Mie Works The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 20-16 Nobono-cho Kameyama-shi, Mie / JP | 02 /
Miyahara, Masato, C/o Mie Works The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 20-16 Nobono-cho Kameyama-shi, Mie / JP | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Hague, Alison Jane, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Hague, Alison Jane, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1990/49] | Leale, Robin George FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305963.2 | 31.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | JP19890137826 | 31.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13782689 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0401028 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0401028 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0401028 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R35/02 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
B60R16/027 (EP,US);
H01R35/04 (KR);
H01R35/025 (EP,US);
H02G11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Verbindervorrichtung | [1990/49] | English: | Connector devices | [1990/49] | French: | Dispositifs de connexion | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.05.1995 | IT | 24.05.1995 | SE | 24.08.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.05.1995 | |
SE | 24.08.1995 | ||
FR | 20.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/16] | SE | 24.08.1995 | |
FR | 20.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 24.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0243047 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3641706 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2164506 (MCGEOCH & CO WILLIAM) |