Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH03170692 | 24.07.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21686189 | 22.08.1989 | JP29196289 | 08.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH038473 | 16.01.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14136089 | 02.06.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0401043 | Global Dossier | 14.08.1991 | A3 | EP0401043 | 05.12.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP14136089 | 02.06.1989 | JP21686189 | 22.08.1989 | JP29196289 | 08.11.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2017893 | 02.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP14136089 | 02.06.1989 | JP21686189 | 22.08.1989 | JP29196289 | 08.11.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0130197B | 06.04.1998 | B1 | KR910000242 | 29.01.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14136089 | 02.06.1989 | JP21686189 | 22.08.1989 | JP29196289 | 08.11.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5091220 | 25.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14136089 | 02.06.1989 | JP21686189 | 22.08.1989 | JP29196289 | 08.11.1989 |