EP0401043 - A method for a surface treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 213-5 Honowari Minamishibata-cho Tokai-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 213-5 Honowari Minamishibata-cho Tokai-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiki, Seinosude c/o Nagoya Oilchemical Co. Ltd., 213-5 Honowari Minamishibata-cho, Tokai-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Makino, Reiji c/o Nagoya Oilchemical Co. Ltd., 213-5 Honowari Minamishibata-cho, Tokai-shi, Aichi / JP | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1990/49] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306014.3 | 01.06.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | JP19890141360 | 02.06.1989 Original published format: JP 14136089 | JP19890216861 | 22.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21686189 | JP19890291962 | 08.11.1989 Original published format: JP 29196289 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0401043 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0401043 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05C21/00, B05B15/04 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
B05B12/20 (EP,US);
B05B12/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/49] | B05B15/04, B05C21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Oberflächenbehandlung | [1990/49] | English: | A method for a surface treatment | [1990/49] | French: | Méthode pour le traitement de surface | [1990/49] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 27.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/48] | 29.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6393370 ; | [A]EP0269529 (IMCARVAU [FR]); | [A]EP0244265 (AVERY INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 333 (C-526)(3180) 08 September 1988, & JP-A-63 93370 (TOYOTA) 23 April 1988,, & JP6393370 A 19880423 |