EP0403148 - High active detergent particles which are dispersible in cold water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jolicoeur, John Michale 700 Riddle Road, Apt. 614 Cincinnati, Ohio 45220 / US | 02 /
Mueller, Frank Joseph 218 Solarama Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45238 / US | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306138.0 | 06.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | US19890364732 | 09.06.1989 Original published format: US 364732 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403148 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403148 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403148 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D1/14 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
C11D11/0082 (EP,US);
C11D17/00 (KR);
C11D1/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/11] |
Former [1990/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Hochaktive Detergensteilchen, die in kaltem Wasser dispergierbar sind | [1990/51] | English: | High active detergent particles which are dispersible in cold water | [1990/51] | French: | Particules de détergent à haute activité dispersables dans l'eau froide | [1990/51] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 14.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP6072999 [ ]; | [A]EP0110731 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON [GB]); | [XP]EP0349200 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | [ ] - DERWENT ACCESSION NO. 85-312 679, Questel Tele- systems (WPIL) DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London * Abstract * & JP - A - 60 - 72 999 ( KAO CORP. ), & JP6072999 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0402112 |