EP0403277 - Latent charge image detecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Atsushi 2-9-36, Sasage, Konan-ku Yokohama / JP | 02 /
Konno, Toshio, Taguchi Biruto 502 1-17-29, Deiki, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama / JP | 03 /
Shimada, Tadayuki, Nippon Victor Nobi-ryo A201 2164, Nagasawa, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1990/51] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306485.5 | 14.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | JP19890152852 | 15.06.1989 Original published format: JP 15285289 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403277 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403277 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403277 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/30, G02F1/135, G02F1/13, G11C11/23, G03G13/22, G03G15/05 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
G02F1/135 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/42] | G03G13/22, G03G15/044, H04N5/30, G02F1/135, G02F1/13, G11C11/23 | ||
Former IPC [1990/51] | G03G13/22, G11C11/23, G02F1/13 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/51] | Title | German: | Nachweisvorrichtung für latentes Ladungsbild | [1990/51] | English: | Latent charge image detecting device | [1990/51] | French: | Dispositif de détection d'une image latente de charge | [1990/51] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6031119 ; | [E]EP0376282 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | [XP]EP0369794 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | [X]WO8903578 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]); | [A]US3951519 (SCHMIDLIN FRED W, et al); | [A]EP0273773 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | [A]DE2011575 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 156 (P-368)(1879), 29 June 1985; & JP - A - 6031119 (SHARP) 16.02.1985, & JP6031119 A 19850629 |