EP0404454 - Disposable medicament inhalation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chawla, Brindra Paul Singh 45 Boundary Road West Bridgford, Nottingham NG2 7BZ / GB | 02 /
Clark, Andrew Reginald 32 Braddon Road Loughborough, Leicestershire / GB | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Craig, Christopher Bradberry, et al Fisons plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Craig, Christopher Bradberry, et al Fisons plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306537.3 | 15.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | GB19890014223 | 21.06.1989 Original published format: GB 8914223 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0404454 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404454 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
A61M15/00 (EP);
A61M15/0043 (EP);
A61M2202/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Wegwerfvorrichtung zur Inhalation von Arzneimitteln | [1990/52] | English: | Disposable medicament inhalation device | [1990/52] | French: | Dispositif à utilisation unique pour l'inhalation de médicaments | [1990/52] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2533065 (TAPLIN GEORGE V, et al); | [A]DE2118842 ; | [AD]US4265236 (PACELLA ANGELO M); | [A]WO8201470 (RIKER LABORATORIES INC [US], et al); | [A]GB2165159 (ORION YHTYMAE OY); | [AD]GB2179260 (HURKA WILHELM, et al); | [A]CH662277 (GLAXO GROUP LTD) |