EP0403308 - Method for reducing facet reflectivities of semiconductor light sources and device thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Laboratories Incorporated 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 01901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states GTE LABORATORIES INCORPORATED 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 01901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rideout, William C. 88 South Harbor Road Townsend, MA 01469 / US | 02 /
Eichen, Elliot 41 Mary Street Arlington, MA 02174 / US | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306575.3 | 15.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | US19890367399 | 16.06.1989 Original published format: US 367399 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0403308 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0403308 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01S3/025 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
H01S5/50 (EP,US);
H01S5/0281 (EP,US);
H01S5/164 (EP,US);
H01S5/5009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verminderung der Oberflächenreflektivität von Halbleiterlichtquellen | [1990/51] | English: | Method for reducing facet reflectivities of semiconductor light sources and device thereof | [1990/51] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour réduire la réflexion aux surfaces des sources de lumière à semi-conducteur | [1990/51] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 30.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/24] | 29.01.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 24, no. 6, 17 March 1988, ENAGE GB pages 335 - 336; N.K. DUTTA ET AL: 'Monolithically integrated laser/photodetector' | [YD] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 24, no. 20, 29 September 1988, ENAGE GB pages 1275 - 1276; C.E. ZAH ET AL: '1.3 um GaInAsP near-travelling-wave laser amplifiers made by combination of angled facets and antireflection coatings.' | [A] - AT & T TECHNICAL JOURNAL. vol. 68, no. 1, January 1989, NEW YORK US pages 5 - 18; N.K. DUTTA: 'III-V device technologies for lightwave applications.' | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 51, no. 23, 7 December 1987, NEW YORK US pages 1879 - 1881; N.S.K. KWONG ET AL: 'High power, high efficiency window buried heterostructure GaAlAs superluminescent diode with an integrated absorber.' | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS. vol. QE-23, no. 6, June 1987, NEW YORK US pages 1021 - 1026; M.G. \BERG ET AL: 'InGaAsP-InP laser amplifier with integrated passive waveguides' |