EP0405808 - Phenoxyalkylamine derivatives and insecticides, acaricides and fungicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/01] | Phenoxyalkylamine derivatives and insecticides, acaricides and fungacides | ||
[1995/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obata, Tokio Ube Industries Ltd., 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Katsutoshi Ube Industries Ltd., 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Toshinobu Ube Industries Ltd., 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 04 /
Ooka, Akira Ube Industries Ltd., 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 05 /
Shikita, Shoja Ube Industries Ltd., 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306581.1 | 15.06.1990 | [1991/01] | Priority number, date | JP19890160949 | 26.06.1989 Original published format: JP 16094989 | [1991/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0405808 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0405808 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/16, A01N43/56 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
C07D231/16 (EP,KR,US);
C07D231/14 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/56 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/01] | Title | German: | Phenoxyalkylamin-Derivate und Insektizide, Akarizide und Fungizide | [1995/02] | English: | Phenoxyalkylamine derivatives and insecticides, acaricides and fungicides | [1995/02] | French: | Dérivés de phénoxyalkylamine et insecticides, acaricides et fongicides | [1991/01] |
Former [1991/01] | Penoxyalkylamin-Derivate und Insektizide, Akarizide und Fungizide | ||
Former [1991/01] | Phenoxyalkylamine derivatives and insecticides, acaricides and fungacides | Examination procedure | 10.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0289879 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]); | [AD]EP0103114 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al); | [AD]EP0196524 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al); | [AP]EP0365925 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) |