EP0414351 - Composite particle dispersion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1991/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waters, Julian Alfred 89 Wallingford Road Goring-on-Thames, Berkshire / GB | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Walter Paul, et al Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough SL2 5DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Johnston, Walter Paul, et al Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough SL2 5DS / GB | ||
Former [1991/09] | Johnston, Walter Paul Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough SL2 5DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90306764.3 | 20.06.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | GB19890016944 | 25.07.1989 Original published format: GB 8916944 | [1991/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414351 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414351 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C08J3/03, C08L101/00, // C08F265/02 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
C08F265/02 (EP,US);
C08J3/005 (EP,US);
C08J3/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/09] | Title | German: | Dispersion von Verbundpartikeln | [1991/09] | English: | Composite particle dispersion | [1991/09] | French: | Dispersion de particules composites | [1991/09] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.1995 | BE | 25.01.1995 | CH | 25.01.1995 | DK | 25.01.1995 | ES | 25.01.1995 | GR | 25.01.1995 | IT | 25.01.1995 | LI | 25.01.1995 | NL | 25.01.1995 | SE | 25.04.1995 | LU | 30.06.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
DK | 25.01.1995 | ||
GR | 25.01.1995 | ||
IT | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
DK | 25.01.1995 | ||
IT | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
DK | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
SE | 25.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
NL | 25.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
BE | 25.01.1995 | ||
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 25.01.1995 | |
CH | 25.01.1995 | ||
LI | 25.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/32] | CH | 25.01.1995 | |
LI | 25.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4097553 (NOVAK ERNEST RICHARD); | [AD]EP0195661 (COURTAULDS PLC [GB]); | [AP]EP0327199 (ICI PLC [GB]) |