EP0407146 - Improved hybrid directional coupler for a radar system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADAR CONTROL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 7317 Ostrow Street San Diego California 92111 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states RADAR CONTROL SYSTEMS CORPORATION 7317 Ostrow Street San Diego, California 92111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, John W. 7817 Ostrow Street San Diego, California 92111 / US | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307266.8 | 03.07.1990 | [1991/02] | Priority number, date | US19890376320 | 06.07.1989 Original published format: US 376320 | [1991/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0407146 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0407146 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/03, H01P5/18 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
G01S7/023 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/034 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/10 (KR);
H01P5/181 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2420/408 (KR);
G01S2013/93185 (EP,KR,US);
G01S2013/9322 (EP,KR,US);
G01S2013/93271 (EP,KR,US);
G01S2013/9329 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/02] | Title | German: | Hybridrichtkoppler für ein Radarsystem | [1991/02] | English: | Improved hybrid directional coupler for a radar system | [1991/02] | French: | Coupleur directif hybride modifié pour système à radar | [1991/02] | File destroyed: | 01.10.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/11] | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.08.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2586993 (RIBLET HENRY J); | [Y]GB712631 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [Y]US3058070 (IRVING REINGOLD, et al); | [AD]US4673937 (DAVIS JOHN W [US]) |