EP0408238 - A frequency synthesiser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LIMITED Cheney Manor Swindon Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LIMITED Cheney Manor Swindon, Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | ||
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, David Antony Willowden, Titchfield Lane Wickham, Hampshire / GB | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Hoste, Colin Francis, et al Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon Essex SS14 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Hoste, Colin Francis, et al The General Electric Company p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | ||
Former [1992/52] | Nicholson, Ronald, et al The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | ||
Former [1991/03] | Lupton, Frederick The General Electric Company, p.l.c., Central Patent Department, Hirst Research Centre Wembley, Middlesex, HA9 7PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307270.0 | 03.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | GB19890015719 | 08.07.1989 Original published format: GB 8915719 | GB19890021444 | 22.09.1989 Original published format: GB 8921444 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0408238 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0408238 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408238 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03C3/09, H03L7/197, H04L27/20 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
H03C3/0975 (EP);
H03C3/0925 (EP);
H03C3/0933 (EP);
H03C3/0941 (EP);
H03C3/095 (EP);
H03L7/197 (EP);
H04L27/2017 (EP);
H03C2200/0029 (EP);
H03C3/02 (EP);
H03C3/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1995/43] |
Former [1991/03] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Frequenzsynthesizer | [1996/13] | English: | A frequency synthesiser | [1991/03] | French: | Synthétiseur de fréquence | [1991/03] |
Former [1991/03] | Frequenzsynthesierer | Examination procedure | 25.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4052672 (ENDERBY RALPH THOMAS, et al); | [A]US4068198 (OTTO JEFFREY C); | [XD]GB2046541 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4242649 (WASHBURN CLYDE JR [US]); | [X]EP0073699 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [XD]US4543542 (OWEN DAVID P [GB]); | [A]WO8600767 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [XD]US4810977 (FLUGSTAD BEN [US], et al); | [XD]EP0322139 (MARCONI INSTRUMENTS LTD [GB]) |