EP0409508 - Retention device for removable retention in a passage or cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARTER HOLT HARVEY PLASTIC PRODUCTS GROUP LIMITED Te Rapa Road Hamilton 2001 / NZ | [1991/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pryor, Raymond John, c/o Carter Holt Harvey Plastic Products Group Ltd., Te Rapa Road Hamilton / NZ | 02 /
Pharaoh, James Frederick, c/o Carter Holt Harvey Plastic Products Group Ltd., Te Rapa Road Hamilton / NZ | [1991/05] |
Former [1991/04] | 01 /
Pryor, Raymond John Te Rapa Road Hamilton / NZ | ||
02 /
Pharaoh, James Frederick Te Rapa Road Hamilton / NZ | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90307712.1 | 13.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | NZ19230002300 | 21.07.1989 Original published format: NZ 230023 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0409508 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0409508 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/08, A61F6/14, A61D19/00 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
A61D7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/04] | A61D19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/04] | Title | German: | Haltgerät zum abnehmbaren Zurückhalten in einer Passage oder Höhle | [1991/04] | English: | Retention device for removable retention in a passage or cavity | [1991/04] | French: | Dispositif de maintien pour maintien amovible dans un passage ou cavité | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 19.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/18] | 18.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4821741 ; | [X]DE271657 ; | [Y]US3911911 ; | [A]US1819828 |