EP0409555 - Heat-sensitive transfer recording medium of the sublimation type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kushi, Kenji, C/o Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujiwara, Tadayuki, Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Jufuku, Kazuhiko, Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 04 /
Kondo, Susumu, Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 05 /
Ryoke, Hideyasu, Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/19] |
Former [1991/04] | 01 /
Kushi, Kenji, C/o Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Fujiwara, Tadayuki, Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Jufuku, Kazuhiko, Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kondo, Susumu, Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Ryoke, Hideyasu, Misubishi Rayon Co. Ltd 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307793.1 | 17.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | JP19890186305 | 19.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18630589 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0409555 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0409555 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409555 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/40, B41M5/00 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B41M5/5209 (EP,US);
B41M2205/32 (EP,US);
B41M5/41 (EP,US);
B41M5/423 (EP,US);
B41M5/5272 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/04] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsübertragungsmaterial vom Sublimationstyp | [1991/04] | English: | Heat-sensitive transfer recording medium of the sublimation type | [1991/04] | French: | Matériau d'enregistrement thermosensible pour le transfert de colorants par sublimation | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.05.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 10.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0169705 (GEN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0209990 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0234563 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0261505 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [A]EP0314205 (GEN CO LTD [JP]) |