Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |
30.03.1994 | First examination report | |
18.12.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] |
21.12.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] |
15.12.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.01.1991 [1991/05] |