Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH072130Y | 25.01.1995 | Y2 | JPH0324350U | 13.03.1991 | U | Priority number | Date | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0523860B | 06.04.1993 | B2 | JPH0366458 | 22.03.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0581346B | 12.11.1993 | B2 | JPH0377747 | 03.04.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5368088 | 29.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | US4286093 | 05.04.1993 | US55419090 | 17.07.1990 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | US82821592 | 30.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU616848B | Global Dossier | 07.11.1991 | B2 | AU5915690 | 07.03.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0409645 | Global Dossier | 03.11.1993 | B1 | EP0409645 | 23.01.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9003531 | 27.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2021589 | 10.12.1996 | C | CA2021589 | 21.01.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69004365T | 11.05.1994 | T2 | DE69004365D1 | 09.12.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2045817T | 16.01.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR950001385B | 18.02.1995 | B1 | KR910002540 | 25.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5103895 | 14.04.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21065389 | 17.08.1989 | JP8451089 | 20.07.1989 | JP20110789 | 01.08.1989 |