EP0409645 - Method and apparatus of continuously casting a metal sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furuya, Takashi 3434 Oaza Shimada Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 02 /
Kasama, Akio 3434 Oaza Shimada Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 03 /
Takeuchi, Hidemaro 3434 Oaza Shimada Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 04 /
Fujii, Motoya 3434 Oaza Shimada Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 05 /
Oka, Hideki 3434 Oaza Shimada Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 06 /
Matsumura, Shogo 3434 Oaza Shimada Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 07 /
Itoh, Ysuo 1-1-1 Edamitsu, Yahatahigashi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 08 /
Sasaki, Kunimasa 6-22 Kanonshinmachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 09 /
Yamamoto, Keiichi 6-22 Kanonshinmachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90307958.0 | 20.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | JP19890084510U | 20.07.1989 Original published format: JP 8451089 U | JP19890201107U | 01.08.1989 Original published format: JP 20110789 U | JP19890210653U | 17.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21065389 U | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409645 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409645 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
B22D11/06 (KR);
B22D11/064 (EP,US);
B22D11/0651 (EP,US);
B22D11/0697 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stranggiessen von Stahlblech | [1991/04] | English: | Method and apparatus of continuously casting a metal sheet | [1991/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour couler en continu une tôle métallique | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58058963 ; | [A]JP56062660 ; | [Y]EP0309247 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0124684 (ALLIED CORP [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 149 (M-225)[1294], 30th June 1983; & JP-A-58 058 963 (MITSUBISHI KEIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 07-04-1983, & JP58058963 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 123 (M-82)[795], 8th August 1981; & JP-A-56 062 660 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 28-05-1981, & JP56062660 A 00000000 |